ND 2205 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical assistance coverage of interpreter services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance coverage of interpreter services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 74
2021-03-23HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 5 2
2021-03-10HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-04HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
2021-02-02SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateReported back, do pass 4 2 0
2021-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback