ND 2205 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 58-04-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to compensation of township elections workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compensation of township elections workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22SenateSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-20SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-17SenateSigned by President
2017-03-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-16SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2017-03-13HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 1
2017-03-10HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-01-31SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-27SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback