ND SB2203 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-31-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sexual assault restraining orders.
Title
Sexual assault restraining orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] |
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |