ND 2203 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the attorney general for human trafficking victims treatment and support services; to provide for reports to the attorney general, legislative assembly, and legislative management; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the attorney general for human trafficking victims treatment and support services; to provide for reports to the attorney general, legislative assembly, and legislative management; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateSigned by Governor 04/24
2017-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-20SenateSigned by President
2017-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-19HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 6
2017-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Kading Schatz Meier
2017-04-05SenateConference committee appointed Myrdal Dever Grabinger
2017-04-05SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-03SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 6
2017-04-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1
2017-03-21HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-03-21HouseReported back, do pass 11 4 0
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-02-16SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-24SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-24SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2017-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2203.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0601-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0601-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0601-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0601-02004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0601-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0601-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-31.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-60.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback