ND SB2201 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15-10-55 and 15.1-19-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the freedom of expression of student journalists.
Title
The freedom of expression of student journalists.
Sponsors
Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. William Devlin [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/05 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2017-03-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 1 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |