ND 2200 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-38-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use tax reporting and remittance on income tax returns; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use tax reporting and remittance on income tax returns; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 85
2021-03-10HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
2021-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-08HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3
2021-02-04SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback