ND SB2200 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-15-06.6, subsection 8 of section 57-15-10, and section 57-15-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to capital project levies; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Capital project levies; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-14 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 15 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Conference committee appointed Steiner Howe Schobinger |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bekkedahl Cook Meyer |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 4 |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 2 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |