ND SB2200 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Berg, Potter A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-23-08.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Berg, Potter A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-23-08.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-13 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-12 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-26 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 001 | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2200.html |