ND 2199 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee Hearing 09:15
Pending: Joint Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Mar 10 @ 9:15 am in Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 25-03.1-34.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to interstate contracts for the treatment of mental illness or substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate contracts for the treatment of mental illness or substance use disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-01-28HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-27SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-01-26SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2021-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback