ND 2199 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 37-17.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to facilitating entry of an out-of-state business to perform disaster or emergency remediation work in this state on critical natural gas, electrical, and telecommunication transmission infrastructure and to provide a limited exemption for that purpose from state and local taxes and fees, licensing, and other requirements during the time in this state employed in disaster or emergency remediation work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating entry of an out-of-state business to perform disaster or emergency remediation work in this state on critical natural gas, electrical, and telecommunication transmission infrastructure and to provide a limited exemption for that purpose from state and local taxes and fees, licensing, and other requirements during the time in this state employed in disaster or emergency remediation work.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateSigned by Governor 03/29
2017-03-27SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-24SenateSigned by President
2017-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-23SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3
2017-03-21HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-01HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2017-03-01HouseRequest return from committee
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-02-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback