ND SB2199 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 37-17.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to facilitating entry of an out-of-state business to perform disaster or emergency remediation work in this state on critical natural gas, electrical, and telecommunication transmission infrastructure and to provide a limited exemption for that purpose from state and local taxes and fees, licensing, and other requirements during the time in this state employed in disaster or emergency remediation work.
Title
Facilitating entry of an out-of-state business to perform disaster or emergency remediation work in this state on critical natural gas, electrical, and telecommunication transmission infrastructure and to provide a limited exemption for that purpose from state and local taxes and fees, licensing, and other requirements during the time in this state employed in disaster or emergency remediation work.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-01 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2017-03-01 | House | Request return from committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |