ND 2198 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce for a nursing workforce recruitment and retention grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce for a nursing workforce recruitment and retention grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
2021-02-18SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-01-26SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-20SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-01-20SenateReported back, do pass 4 2 0
2021-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback