ND 2197 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 24-05-04 and 48-01.2-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to highway improvement contracts to be advertised; and to repeal section 24-05-04.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contracts for road construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts for road construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateSigned by Governor 04/03
2017-03-31SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-29SenateSigned by President
2017-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-03-28SenateConcurred
2017-03-13SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-10HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 1
2017-03-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-03-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-31SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-01-30SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-27SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback