ND 2196 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 15.1-01-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the duties of the kindergarten through grade twelve education coordination council; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-01-03, section 15.1-02-04, subsection 3 of section 15.1-21-02, and section 15.1-21-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of a North Dakota learning continuum and to instructional time and unit requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The establishment of a North Dakota learning continuum and to instructional time and unit requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateSigned by Governor 03/22
2021-03-18SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-18SenateSigned by President
2021-03-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-16SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
2021-03-10HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1
2021-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-02-15HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-02-11SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback