ND SB2195 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 37-17.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limiting or restricting the operation of a private business.
Title
Limiting or restricting the operation of a private business.
Sponsors
Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Cole Conley [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] |
Rep. Andrew Marschall [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |