ND 2194 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 47-16-07.1 and section 47-16-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statements of rental property condition and the application of security deposit toward damages, cleaning, and unpaid rent upon termination of a rental agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statements of rental property condition and the application of security deposit toward damages, cleaning, and unpaid rent upon termination of a rental agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
2021-01-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
2021-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback