ND SB2193 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 40-57.3-01, 40-57.3-01.1, and 40-57.3-02, subsections 21, 22, and 23 of section 57-39.2-01, subdivision e of subsection 1 of section 57-39.2-02.1, and subsection 22 of section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to city lodging and restaurant tax and visitors' committee membership and references to tourist court accommodations.
Title
City lodging and restaurant tax and visitors' committee membership and references to tourist court accommodations.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/26 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 29 |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |