ND 2191 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 57-39.2-02.2 and 57-40.2-02.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the application of sales and use tax to certain sellers located outside this state; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The application of sales and use tax to certain sellers located outside this state; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2019-03-12SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-12SenateSigned by President
2019-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-11SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2019-03-05HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2019-03-04HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-01-18HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-01-16SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback