ND 2190 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tobacco product shipping; to amend and reenact sections 57-36-01 and 57-36-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of tobacco products; to repeal chapter 51-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to remote sales of tobacco products; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote sales of tobacco products; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
2021-01-25SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback