ND 2190 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 48-01.2-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bid requirements for public improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bid requirements for public improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
2017-03-22HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 4 3
2017-03-20HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 27 nays 19
2017-02-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-31SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2017-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-17SenateRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2017-01-17SenateRequest return from committee
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback