ND SB2188 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 11-10 and a new section to chapter 40-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of a political subdivision to regulate the sale of consumer merchandise.
Title
The authority of a political subdivision to regulate the sale of consumer merchandise.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |