ND 2186 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-19 and a new section to chapter 54-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to providing schools with information, programs, and resources regarding student safety and crisis awareness issues to be posted in school common areas and a student safety and crisis awareness reporting program; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing schools with information, programs, and resources regarding student safety and crisis awareness issues to be posted in school common areas and a student safety and crisis awareness reporting program; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
2019-04-22SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-08HouseConference committee appointed Heinert Hoverson Hager
2019-04-04SenateConference committee appointed Rust Fors Marcellais
2019-04-04SenateRefused to concur
2019-03-28SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 4
2019-03-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-03-15HouseRereferred to Education
2019-03-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-03-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2019-02-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2019-02-14SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-13SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2019-02-05SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba2186.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0714-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0714-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0714-03003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0714-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0714-03004a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0714-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0714-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-29.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-54.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-72.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback