ND SB2186 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of an innovative education program; to amend and reenact section 15.1-06-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statutory waivers; and to provide for a report.
Title
Statutory waivers; and to provide for a report.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Rep. Ron Guggisberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/03 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 17 |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |