ND 2181 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 12 of section 23-01-05 and section 37-17.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state health officer's authority and the governor's authority during a declared disaster or emergency; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The state health officer's authority and the governor's authority during a declared disaster or emergency; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateSigned by Governor 03/29
2021-03-25SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-25SenateSigned by President
2021-03-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-22SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4
2021-03-16HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2
2021-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-01-29HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2021-01-28SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-27SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback