ND SB2176 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a distance learning family reimbursement program; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a distance learning family reimbursement program; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |