ND 2175 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 15.1-13-17 and sections 43-51-01, 43-51-11, 43-51-11.1, and 43-51-11.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to occupational licensure of members of the military and military spouses; and to provide for a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licensure of members of the military and military spouses; and to provide for a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateSigned by Governor 03/17
2021-03-12SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-12SenateSigned by President
2021-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1
2021-03-04HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2021-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-01-28HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-27SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-01-26SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback