ND SB2174 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Signed by Governor 01/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Signed by Governor 01/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide borrowing authority and an appropriation to the office of the adjutant general; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide borrowing authority and an appropriation to the office of the adjutant general; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor 01/25 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-01-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-01-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |