ND SB2173 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-17 and a new chapter to title 43 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the interstate medical licensure compact and the payment of fees under the compact.
Title
The interstate medical licensure compact and the payment of fees under the compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Mary Schneider [D] | Rep. Greg Westlind [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |