ND SB2172 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 20.1-08-04.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a preference for moose hunting licenses for individuals seventy-five years of age and older.
Title
A preference for moose hunting licenses for individuals seventy-five years of age and older.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 58 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 27 nays 20 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |