ND 2172 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon in a liquor establishment; to amend and reenact section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
2019-04-23SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23SenateReconsidered
2019-04-23SenateConference committee report rejected
2019-04-23SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-15HouseConference committee appointed Heinert Porter Eidson
2019-04-11SenateConference committee appointed Luick Lemm Bakke
2019-04-11SenateRefused to concur
2019-04-11SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-04-11HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 23
2019-04-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 2 4
2019-02-28HouseCommittee Hearing 01:45
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-01-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba2172.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0846-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0846-01001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0846-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0846-02003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0846-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0846-02007a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0846-04000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-10.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-65.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-73.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback