ND 2171 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 4.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transfer of the international business and trade office from the department of commerce to the agriculture commissioner; to repeal section 54-60-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the international business and trade office; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The international business and trade office; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
2021-02-19SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-21SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-01-21SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2021-01-21SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback