ND SB2171 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
The homestead property tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. James Schmidt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/03 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-02 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens Dockter Zaiser |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Miller Oehlke Dotzenrod |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 1 |
2013-03-29 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-29 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |