ND SB2171 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Grande, Gruchalla A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Grande, Gruchalla A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Fischer [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-23 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-21 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-17 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Dahl Kingsbury Delmore | |
2009-04-13 | Conf comm appointed Olafson Nething Fiebiger | |
2009-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-20 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-20 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 083 nays 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-13 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-12 | Amended on floor | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2171.html |