ND 2168 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 48-01.2-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateSigned by Governor 03/29
2017-03-28SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-27SenateSigned by President
2017-03-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-24SenateConcurred
2017-03-20SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-17HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0
2017-03-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-01-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback