ND SB2167 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 15-10-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to jurisdiction of law enforcement officers employed by Bismarck state college.
Title
Jurisdiction of law enforcement officers employed by Bismarck state college.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Bob Martinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 13 |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 2 3 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |