ND 2167 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 26.1-26-31.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance producer and consultant continuing education; and to amend and reenact sections 26.1-26-02 and 26.1-26-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions relating to insurance producers and consultants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions relating to insurance producers and consultants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSigned by Governor 03/06
2019-03-05SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-05SenateSigned by President
2019-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-04SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0
2019-02-28HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-22HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-01-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback