ND SB2166 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 32-12.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to increasing liability limits for political subdivisions.
Title
Increasing liability limits for political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. Arne Osland [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] |
Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 24 nays 20 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |