ND SB2166 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 40-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of property tax incentives granted by a city; to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 40-57.1-03, section 40-58-20.2, subsection 2 of section 40-63-01, and subsection 3 of section 54-35-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of property tax incentives granted by a city and evaluation of economic development tax incentives; to provide for legislative management studies; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Approval of property tax incentives granted by a city and evaluation of economic development tax incentives; to provide for legislative management studies; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Christopher Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 9 |
2017-04-14 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Olson Howe Grueneich |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Cook Unruh Dotzenrod |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 17 |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |