ND 2166 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 40-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of property tax incentives granted by a city; to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 40-57.1-03, section 40-58-20.2, subsection 2 of section 40-63-01, and subsection 3 of section 54-35-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of property tax incentives granted by a city and evaluation of economic development tax incentives; to provide for legislative management studies; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approval of property tax incentives granted by a city and evaluation of economic development tax incentives; to provide for legislative management studies; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateSigned by Governor 04/24
2017-04-21SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-17SenateSigned by President
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-14HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 9
2017-04-14HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-13HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-04-13SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-12SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-04HouseConference committee appointed Olson Howe Grueneich
2017-03-31SenateConference committee appointed Cook Unruh Dotzenrod
2017-03-31SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-29SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-28HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 17
2017-03-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-24HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 8
2017-02-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2166.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0148-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0148-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0148-02002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0148-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0148-02006a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0148-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0148-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-56.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-67.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-68.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback