ND 2164 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
Pending: Joint Industry, Business, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 43-51-10.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to occupational rules in cases of emergencies; and to amend and reenact sections 43-51-04 and 43-51-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to occupational licensure in cases of emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licensure in cases of emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-02HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
2021-01-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-22SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback