ND SB2163 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to proof of liability insurance for early childhood programs; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Proof of liability insurance for early childhood programs; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Sen. Arne Osland [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 73 |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 5 2 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |