ND 2162 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to professional student exchange programs; to amend and reenact sections 43-28.1-01 and 43-28.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the dental student loan repayment program; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The dental student loan repayment program; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 11 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 79
2017-03-22HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 10
2017-02-09SenateDivision B passed
2017-02-09SenateDivision A passed
2017-02-09SenateDivision of bill
2017-02-09SenateAmendment adopted
2017-02-09SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2017-02-09SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
2017-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback