ND 2161 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Committee Hearing 02:15
Pending: Joint Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Mar 9 @ 2:15 am in Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a mental health provider registry and a behavioral health bed management system; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A mental health provider registry and a behavioral health bed management system; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-10HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
2021-02-08SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-03SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-03SenateAmendment adopted
2021-02-02SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2021-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback