ND 2161 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 14-07.1-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to domestic violence program records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence program records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-13SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-13SenateSigned by President
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-12HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-10HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-10SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-07SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-06HouseConference committee appointed Klemin Magrum Hanson
2017-03-31SenateConference committee appointed Anderson Clemens Piepkorn
2017-03-31SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-21SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-20HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
2017-03-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-03-02HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2017-03-02HouseRequest return from committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-17SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback