ND SB2160 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-27-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state foundation aid payments to school districts.
Title
State foundation aid payments to school districts.
Sponsors
Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] |
Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |