ND 2159 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subdivision d of subsection 2 of section 10-32.1-39, paragraph 1 of subdivision d of subsection 3 of section 10-32.1-39, and paragraph 1 of subdivision q of subsection 4 of section 10-32.1-39 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to management of a limited liability company; and to provide for retroactive application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Management of a limited liability company; and to provide for retroactive application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateSigned by Governor 03/15
2017-03-14SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-13SenateSigned by President
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-10SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4
2017-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback