ND 2157 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-24.4-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the North Dakota library coordinating council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Membership of the North Dakota library coordinating council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateSigned by Governor 03/22
2021-03-17SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-17SenateSigned by President
2021-03-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-11SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 8
2021-03-05HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 1 2
2021-03-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-01-26HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-01-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-22SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback