ND 2156 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 12.1-31-03, 12.1-31-03.1, 12.1-31-03.3, and 51-32-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the prohibition of an individual under twenty-one years of age from purchasing, possessing, or using tobacco products or electronic smoking devices; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The prohibition of an individual under twenty-one years of age from purchasing, possessing, or using tobacco products or electronic smoking devices; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-30SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-30SenateSigned by President
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-24SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 30, Emergency clause carried
2021-03-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-09HouseRereferred to Political Subdivisions
2021-03-09HouseRequest return from committee
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
2021-01-19HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7, Emergency clause carried
2021-01-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-01-13SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback