ND 2151 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 23-06.5-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to health care directives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care directives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateSigned by Governor 04/04
2017-04-03SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-31SenateSigned by President
2017-03-31HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-30SenateConcurred
2017-03-28SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-03-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-21HouseRereferred to Human Services
2017-02-21HouseRequest return from committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-01-25SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback