ND 2149 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 12.1-32-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the penalty for a class A misdemeanor; to amend and reenact subdivision? k of subsection? 3 of section 12.1-23-05, subsection 5 of section 12.1-32-01, subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 12.1-32-02.1, subsection? 3 of section 19-03.1-22.2, section 19-03.1-23, subsection? 2 of section 19-03.1-23.1, section 19-03.1-23.4, paragraph 3 of subdivision e of subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-36, subdivision e of subsection 5 of section 19-03.1-36, subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-45, and subsection 29 of section 40-05-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to grading of theft offenses, illegal possession of prescription capsules, pills, or tablets, possession of marijuana, and misdemeanor marijuana convictions being excluded as prior offenses for purposes of determining mandatory terms of imprisonment; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grading of theft offenses, illegal possession of prescription capsules, pills, or tablets, possession of marijuana, and misdemeanor marijuana convictions being excluded as prior offenses for purposes of determining mandatory terms of imprisonment; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
2017-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-05HouseConference committee appointed K. Koppelman Satrom M. Nelson
2017-04-03SenateConference committee appointed Armstrong D. Larson Nelson
2017-04-03SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 5
2017-03-29HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 0 4
2017-03-15HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-03-15HouseAmendment adopted
2017-03-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-21HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-02-13SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2017-02-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-24SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2149.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0619-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0619-01001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0619-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0619-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0619-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0619-03001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0619-04000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-33.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-58.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback